Title and statement of responsibility area
Title proper
General material designation
Parallel title
Other title information
Title statements of responsibility
Title notes
- Source of title proper: Title based on contents of the fonds
Level of description
Reference code
Edition area
Edition statement
Edition statement of responsibility
Class of material specific details area
Statement of scale (cartographic)
Statement of projection (cartographic)
Statement of coordinates (cartographic)
Statement of scale (architectural)
Issuing jurisdiction and denomination (philatelic)
Dates of creation area
Date(s)
-
1897-1978, predominant 1917-1960 (Creation)
- Creator
- Scott, Robert Clyde, 1879-1960
Physical description area
Physical description
40 cm of textual records
ca. 560 photographs
Publisher's series area
Title proper of publisher's series
Parallel titles of publisher's series
Other title information of publisher's series
Statement of responsibility relating to publisher's series
Numbering within publisher's series
Note on publisher's series
Archival description area
Name of creator
Biographical history
Robert Clyde Scott was born in Paisely, Bruce County, Ontario on November 15, 1879, the eldest son of Robert Scott and Euphemia McTaggart. He went to Alberta at around 1900, and worked for the CPR as a brakeman and as a lay supply for the Methodist Missionaries of Red Deer. In 1907 he entered Victoria College, Toronto, and in 1911 graduated with a B.A.; he was received into full connexion at the Alberta Conference in 1912. In 1913 Scott came to British Columbia and began marine mission work on Howe Sound, with headquarters at Gibson's Landing. This work involved ministering to the physical as well as spiritual needs of those in the logging camps, Indian villages, fishing villages and lighthouses along the coast. He met Amelia Wakefield while he was stationed at Gibson's Landing, and they married on May 26, 1915. She gave birth to their only child, Robert Wakefield Scott on November 17, 1916. Amelia died in 1950. In 1917 Scott's headquarters were moved to Hazelton, and in 1919 he reopened the Indian Mission at Cape Mudge, the mission boat Iwyll being brought to the coast for his use, and he remained there until 1925. From that point until 1933 he was stationed at Ocean Falls, with the mission boats Thomas Crosby II and Thomas Crosby IV. During the years 1933-1934 Scott was stationed on the West coast of Vancouver Island, with the mission boat Melvin Swartout. He left marine work in 1933, when he was appointed principal of Coqualeetza Residential School (Previously the Coqualeetza Institute), succeeding George H. Raley in that post. The following year, he was elected President of the B.C. Conference of the United Church. When the Coqualeetza school closed, and the Alberni Indian Residential School was opened, Scott moved to the new school as principal, and remained until 1944. For the next four years Scott was on disability leave due to a severe throat condition. In May of 1947, he completed his book My Captain Oliver (United Church Publishing House, 1947), about Captain William Oliver, who built and skippered the Thomas Crosby III. In 1948 Scott retired and took over the position of visiting chaplain to patients in the Coqualeetza Sanitarium, and then to patients in the Hospital for Indians in Nanaimo; later that year, the United Church honoured him with the addition of the Robert C. Scott to its fleet, and he was awarded the honourary degree of Doctor of Divinity by Union College of British Columbia in 1950. On October 5, 1951, Scott married his second wife, Eunice Phillips of Richmond, B.C. He continued his hospital visits until his death in Vancouver on June 4, 1960.
Custodial history
Scope and content
Fonds consists of the following series: Vital records (1930-1960); Marine mission records (1919-1948); Committee and institutional records (1897-1958); Financial records and fundraising (1923-1957); Correspondence files (1917-1960); Manuscripts and writings (1919-1951); Published and collected materials (1918-1959); and Photographs (1915-1966).
Notes area
Physical condition
Immediate source of acquisition
The bulk of the records likely were received from Eunice Scott prior to her death in 1980. A smaller 1984 accession was passed on to Lawrence Sieber by Eunice's executor, Grace Schutz, in 1983, for deposit at the Archives.
Arrangement
Some records of George H. Raley, probably received by Scott around the time of Raley's death in 1958 and kept separately, are physically arranged with these records, but are described separately under Raley's name.
Language of material
- English
Script of material
Location of originals
Availability of other formats
Restrictions on access
Some access restrictions apply; consult file list
Terms governing use, reproduction, and publication
Finding aids
Series descriptions and file list available
Uploaded finding aid
Associated materials
Accruals
Further accruals expected
Alpha-numeric designations
BCAUL control number: UCCBC-42
Alternative identifier(s)
Standard number
Standard number
Access points
Place access points
Name access points
- Scott, Eunice M. (Subject)
- Sieber, Lawrence G. (Subject)
- Scott, Amelia (Subject)
- Raley, George Henry, 1863 or 1864-1958 (Subject)
- Coqualeetza Institute (Subject)
- Alberni Indian Residential School (Subject)
- Melvin Swartout I (Mission boat) (Subject)
- Thomas Crosby III (Mission boat) (Subject)
- Thomas Crosby IV (Mission boat) (Subject)
- West Coast Mission (Subject)
- Iwyll (Mission boat) (Subject)
- Coqualeetza Sanitorium (Subject)
- Coqualeetza Institute (Residential school : Sardis, B.C.) (Subject)
Genre access points
Control area
Description record identifier
Institution identifier
Rules or conventions
Rules for Archival Description
Status
Level of detail
Dates of creation, revision and deletion
Revised December 15, 2021
Language of description
- English